EP1326388 - System and method for avoiding stall using timer for high-speed downlink packet access system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2010/22] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yi, Seung-June Daechung Apt. 303-403, Kaepo-Dong Kangnam-Gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yeo, Woon-Young Satbyul Apt. 612-1107, 1109-4, Bisan-Dong Dongan-Gu, Anyang, Kyungki-Do / KR | 03 /
Lee, So-Young Twikye 2cha Apt. 366-702, Okeum-Dong Kunpo, Kyungki-Do / KR | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000116.8 | 02.01.2003 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | KR20020000632 | 05.01.2002 Original published format: KR 2002000632 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1326388 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1326388 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326388 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
H04W28/14 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (KR);
H04B7/0604 (EP,US);
H04B7/15535 (EP,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1841 (EP,US);
H04L1/1848 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/28 (EP,US);
H04L47/34 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0042 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0083 (EP,US);
H04L69/28 (US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W52/143 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/245 (EP,US);
H04W52/46 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W80/02 (KR);
H04B7/15507 (EP,US);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0096 (EP,US);
H04W52/225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/28] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Blockierungsvermeidung für ein Hochgeschwindigkeits-Downlink-Paketzugriffssystem benutzt unter Verwendung eines Zeitgebers | [2003/28] | English: | System and method for avoiding stall using timer for high-speed downlink packet access system | [2003/28] | French: | Système et procédé pour éviter des blocages utilisant une temporisation, dans un système d'accès pour paquets descendant à grande vitesse | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08169464.8 / EP2023556 | EP09167067.9 / EP2107738 | EP09167069.5 / EP2107739 | EP09167074.5 / EP2117185 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2010 | BE | 02.06.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | HU | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | IE | 02.01.2011 | LU | 02.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 02.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "HARQ Stall Avoidance", 3GPP RAN TSG/WG2, (20011126), no. MEETING 25, pages 1 - 5, XP002253923 [X] 1-35 * the whole document * | [PA] - "Window based mechanism for HARQ stall avoidance", 3GPP RAN TSG/WG2, (20020107), no. MEETING 26, pages 1 - 6, XP002253921 [PA] 1-35 * the whole document * |