Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4179870B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2008 | B2 | JP2003261864 | 19.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20020029 | 10.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1327644 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B1 | EP1327644 | 16.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20020029 | 10.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20020029 | 10.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20020029 | 10.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7015278 | 21.03.2006 | B2 | US2003166769 | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20020029 | 10.01.2002 |