EP1327644 - Hydro-oil-repellent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/30] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trombetta, Tania Via Cesare Battisti 19 20050 Sovico, Milano / IT | 02 /
Turri, Stefano Via Volturno 80/Cedri 20047 Brugherio, Milano / IT | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay (Société Anonyme) Intellectual Property Department Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2003/29] | Sama, Daniele, Dr. Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03000129.1 | 03.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI00029 | 10.01.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020029 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327644 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327644 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/50, C08G18/10, C08G18/08, C08G18/76, D06M15/576 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
D06M15/576 (EP,US);
C08G18/0814 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/5015 (EP,US);
C08G18/7642 (EP,US);
D06M2200/11 (EP,US);
D06M2200/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2123 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2164 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2172 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2197 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/285 (EP,US);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3275 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/15] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wasser- und Öl-abstossende Zusammensetzungen | [2003/29] | English: | Hydro-oil-repellent compositions | [2003/29] | French: | Compositions conférant des propriétés oléophobes et hydrophobes | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0273449 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]US5910557 (AUDENAERT FRANS A [BE], et al) [A] 1-21 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1038919 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1059319 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,13,14,17-21 * page 5, lines 27,28 * * page 7, lines 23,24 * * page 10, lines 39-49 *; | [X]EP1162220 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * example 1; claim 14 * |