EP1312769 - Turbocharger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGUILAR, Scott, Grover 3716 E1 Caminiato Street, La Crescenta CA 91214 / US | 02 /
ELPERN, David, George 848 Westchester Place, Los Angeles CA 90005 / US | 03 /
HEBBEN, Peter, John 4906 Sharynne Lane, Torrance CA 90505 / US | 04 /
JENSEN, Lloyd Bill 1500 Shay Road, Big Bear City CA 92314-9180 / US | 05 /
COLEMAN, Steven, Walter 4225 Paseo de Oro, Cypress CA 90630 / US | 06 /
SAHAY, Sunhil Nandan 525 Avenida Mirola, Palos Verdes Estates CA 90274 / US | 07 /
MILLIKEN, Douglas, Alan 2360 Manchester Court, Thousand Oaks CA 91362 / US | 08 /
LOPEZ, Raymond, Leo 10559 Angel Avenue, Fountain Valley CA 92708 / US | 09 /
WICK, Werner 2605 West 226th Street, Torrance CA 90505 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/21] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03000133.3 | 06.08.1998 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | US19970054908P | 06.08.1997 Original published format: US 54908 P | US19980112517 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: US 112517 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312769 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312769 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1312769 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/16, F01D25/18, F02C6/12, F04D29/26, F04D29/28 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
F01D5/025 (EP);
F01D25/16 (EP);
F01D25/168 (EP);
F01D25/18 (EP);
F02C6/12 (EP);
F04D29/023 (EP);
F04D29/0513 (EP);
F04D29/266 (EP);
F04D29/284 (EP);
F16C17/10 (EP);
F16C27/02 (EP);
F16D1/06 (EP);
F05D2220/40 (EP);
F05D2230/90 (EP);
F05D2300/509 (EP);
F05D2300/611 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/21] | Title | German: | Abgasturbolader | [2003/21] | English: | Turbocharger | [2003/21] | French: | Turbocompresseur | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98939256.8 / EP1002185 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2005
21.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE Abb Turbo Systems AG Bruggerstrasse 71a, Postfach 5400 Baden / CH Opponent's representative ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2005
21.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE Abb Turbo Systems AG Bruggerstrasse 71a, Postfach 5400 Baden / CH Opponent's representative ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | 20.05.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.09.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2005 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.07.2006 | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.08.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.09.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29702119U (KUEHNLE KOPP KAUSCH AG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 2 * | Examination | US3961867 | JPS56102543 | EP0138516 | US4986733 | EP0429656 | US5209595 | EP0834645 |