EP1328104 - System on a chip for network storage devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Twomey, John E. 23 Madawaska Street Beford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/29] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000503.7 | 08.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | US20020347489P | 10.01.2002 Original published format: US 347489 P | US20020112896 | 01.04.2002 Original published format: US 112896 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1328104 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1328104 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1328104 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0485 (EP,US);
H04L63/164 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | System auf einem Chip für Netzwerkspeichervorrichtungen | [2003/29] | English: | System on a chip for network storage devices | [2003/29] | French: | Système embarqué pour dispositifs de stockage réseau | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2003 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | IT | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | IE | 08.01.2013 | LU | 08.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 08.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 08.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5778071 (CAPUTO ANTHONY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,15,22,23 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 51 * * column 6, line 12 - column 11, line 17; figure 2 *; | [A]US5896499 (MCKELVEY MARK AMBROSE [US]) [A] 1-10,15-23 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - line 24 * * column 5, line 48 - column 7, line 50 *; | [XY]WO0105086 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,15-17,19-23 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 13, line 14 * [Y] 11-14,5,18; | [Y]WO0180013 (STOREAGE NETWORKING TECHNOLOGI [IL], et al) [Y] 11-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 37 * * page 10, line 10 - page 13, line 2; figures 1-3 * * page 21, line 41 - page 23, line 41; figures 15-19 *; | [Y]US6327625 (WANG CHI-LIE [US], et al) [Y] 5,18 * column 2, lines 15-30; claims 7,8 *; | [A] - TOM CLARK, IP Storage in Data Center Applications pages 201-220, BOSTON, MA 02116 USA, ADDISON WESLEY INC, (20011001), XP002336284 [A] 11-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0105086 |