EP1302712 - Hand operated rotary actuated valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swagelok Company 29500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Swagelok Company 29500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasak, David J. 9695 Alder Court Concord, Ohio 44060 / US | 02 /
Fornes, Michael A. 1216 French Avenue Lakewood, Ohio 44107 / US | 03 /
Peteritis, Jernnifer K. 461 Southington Boulevard Painesville, Ohio 44077 / US | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000639.9 | 13.10.1999 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | US19980104017P | 13.10.1998 Original published format: US 104017 P | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302712 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302712 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K35/02 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
F16K7/16 (EP);
F16K35/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/16] | Title | German: | Handbetätigbare Drehventile | [2003/16] | English: | Hand operated rotary actuated valve | [2003/16] | French: | Actionneur à main de soupape rotative | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99954835.7 / EP1121550 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4577831 (DIBARTOLO ERNEST A [US]) [A] 1,10 * column A *; | [A]US5152187 (LAFEMINA FIORE [US]) [A] 1,7* column 2, line 10 - line 47; figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]US5551124 (ZERINGUE CLAY M [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 24 - line 51; figures 12,13 *; | [X]US5671904 (MINUTILLO RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1,7-9 * column 3, line 13 - line 50; figures 3,5 *; | [A]GB2312489 (HOLBURN DAVID AUSTIN [GB]) [A] 1,7 * page 6 - page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1A,2A * |