Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
25.04.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.11.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
08.11.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.03.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.11.2004 | First examination report | |
08.11.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.11.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.01.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
15.01.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.12.2003 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.12.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
29.08.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |
14.03.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
14.03.2003 | Change - inventor | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
28.02.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
19.02.2003 | Renewal fee |