Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002527695 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US10401798 | 13.10.1998 | US9923650 | 13.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1121550 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10401798 | 13.10.1998 | US9923650 | 13.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1302712 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2003 | A3 | EP1302712 | 16.04.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10401798 | 13.10.1998 | EP99954835 | 13.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6463955 | 15.10.2002 | B2 | US2001052362 | 20.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10401798 | 13.10.1998 | US82658001 | 05.04.2001 | US9923650 | 13.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0022327 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2000 | A8 | WO0022327 | 20.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10401798 | 13.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW480381B | 21.03.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | US10401798 | 13.10.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP1121550 |