EP1439096 - Occupant protection arrangement for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 600, Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states FGTI, Ford Global Technologies Inc. Suite 600, Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardå, Peter Dr Westrings Gata 21 N 413 24 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
Levenstam, Mårten Langedragsvägen 128 426 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2006/42] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
Harda, Peter Dr Westrings Gata 21 N 413 24 Göteborg / SE | ||
02 /
Levenstam, Marten Langedragsvägen 128 426 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | Representative(s) | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03000646.4 | 16.01.2003 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439096 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1439096 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
B60R21/231 (EP);
B60R21/2338 (EP);
B60R2021/23107 (EP);
B60R2021/23316 (EP);
B60R2021/23324 (EP);
B60R2021/23332 (EP);
B60R2021/23382 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2005/15] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutzsystem für Kraftfahrzeuginsassen | [2004/30] | English: | Occupant protection arrangement for a motor vehicle | [2004/30] | French: | Dispositif de protection des occupants d'un véhicule | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3731949 (RADKE D) [X] 1-4,6,9 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4300894 (CUMMING RICHARD J, et al) [X] 1-3,5,9* column 5, line 11 - line 36; figure 14 *; | [X]US2001033072 (KUMAGAI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1,2,5,6,9-16 *; | [X]US2002171232 (ABE KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-5,9 * the whole document * |