EP1329343 - Constructional element, especially for the steering geometry of road vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REMPEL Stanztechnik GmbH & Co. KG Grafweg 2 58815 Plettenberg / DE | [2007/09] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states REMPEL Stanztechnik GmbH & Co. KG Grafweg 2 58815 Plettenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giersdorf, Klaus Haydnstrasse 1 58840 Plettenberg / DE | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Grosse-Valentin-Gihske ,Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000910.4 | 16.01.2003 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | DE2002102403 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202403 | DE2002155813 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10255813 | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329343 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329343 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329343 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60G7/00, F16C7/02, F16C11/06, F16F1/393 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B60G7/001 (EP);
F16C7/02 (EP);
B60G2204/416 (EP);
B60G2206/11 (EP);
B60G2206/8201 (EP);
F16C2326/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/30] | Title | German: | Konstruktionselement, insbesondere für die Lenkgeometrie von Strassenfahrzeugen | [2003/30] | English: | Constructional element, especially for the steering geometry of road vehicles | [2003/30] | French: | Elément de construction, notammment pour la géométrie de la direction de véhicules routiers | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.02.2007 | CZ | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | EE | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | FR | 28.02.2007 | IE | 28.02.2007 | IT | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | SI | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | TR | 28.02.2007 | BG | 29.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | HU | 01.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 28.02.2007 | |
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
HU | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 28.02.2007 | |
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 28.02.2007 | |
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS58188712 ; | [X]JP9254621 ; | [A]JP2000071730 ; | [A]US1817529 (NEWTON SKILLMAN) [A] * figure 6 *; | [A]DE575296 (O & S BEARING COMPANY) [A] * figure 6 *; | [Y]US4146340 (SMITH JR JOSEPH E) [Y] 9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4189249 (GAINES DONALD R [US], et al) [A] * column 2, line 6 - line 9 * * figures 3,4 *; | [YA]EP0351689 (JOERN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4,8-12,15,16 * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * column 5, line 27 - line 30 * * column 5, line 49 - line 53 * * column 6, line 20 - line 21 * * column 7, line 21 - line 28 * * column 7, line 40 - line 56 * * column 8, line 7 - line 8 * * column 8, line 24 - line 27 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,5; | [YA]DE3921468 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [Y] 11,15 * column 2, line 17 - line 19 * * figure 1 * * figure 1 * * figure 5 * [A] 17; | [A]EP0479598 (MAC LEAN FOGG CO [US]) [A] * column 3, line 23 - line 25 * * column 3, line 50 - line 54 * * column 4, line 47 - line 49 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE4132779 (VORWERK & SOHN [DE]) [A] * column 1, line 63 - line 64 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0819556 (JOERN GMBH [DE]) [A] * figures 2-4 *; | [XAY]EP1092891 (TRELLEBORG AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 1, line 55 - line 56 * * column 2, line 2 - line 3 * * column 3, line 17 - line 20 * * column 2, line 36 - line 40 * [A] 19 [Y] 3,4,8-12,15,16; | [Y]US6241267 (DZIADOSZ LAWRENCE M [US], et al) [Y] 12 * column 5, line 35 - line 36 * * figure 5 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840210), vol. 0080, no. 32, Database accession no. (M - 275), & JP58188712 A 19831104 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK; others: 01) [X] 1,8,10 * abstract * [Y] 4,9,11,12,15,16 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP9254621 A 19970930 (YAMAKAWA IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000071730 A 20000307 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | DE2952176 | DE3109565 | EP0296568 | DE3921468 |