EP1380383 - Cutting tool holder and method for using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President of Gifu University 1-1, Yanagido Gifu-shi Gifu 501-1193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states President of Gifu University 1-1, Yanagido Gifu-shi, Gifu 501-1193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwahara, Minoru 1-5-15, Tsubogawadai Seki-shi, Gifu 501-3946 / JP | 02 /
Fuji, Hiroshi 20-3, Kitsunebora, Yazako, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 480-1103 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Takao 3-35, Kano-Asahi-machi Gifu-shi, Gifu 500-8452 / JP | 04 /
Oumura, Takashi 2-71, Soharasaruko-cho Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0895 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001270.2 | 22.01.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020200870 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002200870 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1380383 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1380383 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q5/58, B23Q11/04, B23D79/10 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
B23D79/10 (EP,US);
Y10T83/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8776 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schneidwerkzeughalter und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb | [2004/03] | English: | Cutting tool holder and method for using the same | [2004/03] | French: | Porte-outil pour outil de coupe et procédé pour son utilisation | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1142501 ; | [A]DE3523865 (CASTOLIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]DE4239344 (SULZER AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11042501 A 19990216 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |