EP1332779 - Amusement ride car system, especially for fun-fairs, amusement parks or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Roboter GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | For all designated states Robocoaster Limited 21 Miranda Drive Warwick Gates Warwick CV34 6FE / GB | [2007/46] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states KUKA Roboter GmbH Blücherstrasse 144 86165 Augsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Robocoaster Limited 21 Miranda Drive Warwick Gates, Warwick CV34 6FE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Gol, Gino 89 Richmond Drive Perton, South Staffordshire WV6 7RP / GB | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Lempert, Jost, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Lempert, Jost, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001507.7 | 23.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | DE2002103729 | 30.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10203729 | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332779 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332779 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63G21/08, A63G1/34 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
A63G21/08 (EP,US);
A63G1/34 (EP,US);
B25J11/003 (EP,US);
B25J5/02 (EP,US);
A63G31/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | Fahrgerät, insbesondere für Vergnügungsparks, -Messen oder dergleichen | [2003/32] | English: | Amusement ride car system, especially for fun-fairs, amusement parks or the like | [2003/32] | French: | Manège avec véhicules, en particulier pour fêtes foraines, parcs d'attractions ou similaire | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 18.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | AT | 23.01.2008 | LU | 23.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | IT | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
TR | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE441391 (WILLIAM FREDERICK MANGELS) [A] 27 * page 3, column L, line 1 - line 28 *; | [A]NL9401636 (VEKOMA INTERNATIONAL B V [NL]) [A] 7 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US5527221 (BROWN RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9,10,12,14-20,30 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 40 * * column 8, line 32 - line 51; figures 1,2,6C *; | [A]US5595121 (ELLIOTT STEVEN A [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9,11-21,23-25,28-30 * column 4, line 40 - column 10, line 29 * * column 12, lines 53-62 * * column 13, line 11 - column 18, line 25; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US6302029 (DISTELRATH VOLKER [DE]) [A] 31 * abstract *; | [A]WO0195989 (ROBOCOASTER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 9 * * page 10, lines 4-10; figures 1,3A,12A,12B *; | [A]US6341564 (OCHI YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,6,12-14,19* column 23, line 10 - column 24, line 65; figure 39 * | by applicant | WO0195989 |