EP1333165 - Method of determining the amount of particulate accumulated in a particulate filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boretto, Gianmarco Via Giusti, 12 10042 Nichelino / IT | 02 /
Corrias, Silvio Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03001562.2 | 23.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | IT2002TO00072 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: IT TO20020072 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1333165 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1333165 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N9/00, G01N15/02, F01N11/00 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N11/002 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N9/002 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1411 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0812 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der in einem Filter angesammelten Partikelmenge | [2003/32] | English: | Method of determining the amount of particulate accumulated in a particulate filter | [2003/32] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer la quantité des particules accumulées dans un filtre à particules | [2004/33] |
Former [2003/32] | Méthode pour déterminer la quantité des particules accumulée dans un filtre à particules | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.01.2005 | BG | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | CZ | 12.01.2005 | EE | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | SI | 12.01.2005 | SK | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | CY | 23.01.2005 | LU | 23.01.2005 | IE | 24.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | HU | 13.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/04] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 23.01.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
HU | 13.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 23.01.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
HU | 13.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/14] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
HU | 13.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | BG | 12.01.2005 | |
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 12.01.2005 | |
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 12.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3723470 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5511413 (PFISTER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1081347 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1108866 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |