25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
11.07.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
03.08.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
18.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.03.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
02.03.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
25.11.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.09.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.01.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.07.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.07.2005 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.07.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
19.11.2004 |
First examination report |
|
15.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
14.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
14.03.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
05.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|