Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3057471B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2000 | B2 | JPH0753373 | 28.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | JP12483894 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2277520 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2011 | A3 | EP2277520 | 26.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07014995 | 07.06.1994 | EP03001570 | 07.06.1994 | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | EP94108687 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1844774 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2008 | A3 | EP1844774 | 17.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03001570 | 07.06.1994 | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | EP94108687 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1306089 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | EP1306089 | 02.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | EP94108687 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0753301 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | B1 | EP0753301 | 15.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | EP94108687 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1306088 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | EP1306088 | 02.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | EP96115146 | 07.06.1994 | EP94108687 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6348481 | 19.02.2002 | B2 | US2001004640 | 21.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28716799 | 06.04.1999 | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | US75835501 | 12.01.2001 | US25454194 | 06.06.1994 | US88304097 | 26.06.1997 | US56385500 | 04.05.2000 | US35101194 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6420405 | 16.07.2002 | B2 | US2001011098 | 02.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28716799 | 06.04.1999 | US78357901 | 15.02.2001 | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | US25454194 | 06.06.1994 | US88304097 | 26.06.1997 | US56385500 | 04.05.2000 | US35101194 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5721263 | 24.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | US25454194 | 06.06.1994 | US35101194 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5958961 | 28.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | US25454194 | 06.06.1994 | US88304097 | 26.06.1997 | US35101194 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6228874 | 08.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US28716799 | 06.04.1999 | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | US25454194 | 06.06.1994 | US88304097 | 26.06.1997 | US56385500 | 04.05.2000 | US35101194 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0628313 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2005 | B1 | EP0628313 | 14.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE239471T | 15.05.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE311188T | 15.12.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE372115T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE372116T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2125251 | 26.04.2005 | C | CA2125251 | 08.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY2370 | 04.06.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69432644T | 27.11.2003 | T2 | DE69432644D1 | 12.06.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69434560T | 08.06.2006 | T2 | DE69434560D1 | 05.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69435021T | 29.05.2008 | T2 | DE69435021D1 | 18.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69435022T | 29.05.2008 | T2 | DE69435022D1 | 18.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0753301T | 21.07.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2193217T | 01.11.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT753301E | 29.08.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG45336 | 16.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13552493 | 07.06.1993 | Type | Earlier application | EP0628313 | EP0753301 |