EP1332951 - Vehicle wheel shield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morin, Mark Joseph 85 Odds Drive Restoule, Ontario Canada P0H 2R0 / CA | [2005/35] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Morin, Mark Joseph 85 Odds Drive Restoule, Ontario, Canada P0H 2R0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morin, Mark Joseph 85 Odds's Drive Restoule Ontario POH 2RO / CA | 02 /
Vranckx, Dale Richard 85 Odd's Drive Restoule Ontario POH 2RO / CA | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001618.2 | 24.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | US20020054936 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: US 54936 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332951 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332951 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/18 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
B62D25/188 (EP,US);
Y02T10/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | Schmutzfänger für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2003/32] | English: | Vehicle wheel shield | [2003/32] | French: | Bavette pare-boue pour véhicules | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | CY | 31.08.2005 | CZ | 31.08.2005 | EE | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | FR | 31.08.2005 | IT | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | NL | 31.08.2005 | SI | 31.08.2005 | SK | 31.08.2005 | TR | 31.08.2005 | BG | 30.11.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | DE | 01.12.2005 | ES | 12.12.2005 | IE | 24.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | PT | 23.02.2006 | HU | 01.03.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
EE | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IT | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
HU | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
EE | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IT | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
HU | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IT | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
HU | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
HU | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2605119 (EARNEST MAXWELL L) [A] 14* figure 3 *; | [A]GB1058892 (THORKILD BECH) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4921276 (MORIN ALBERT Z [CA]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,15 * column 4, line 16 - line 41 * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]DE4027073 (DUNLOP GMBH [DE]) [A] 13 * column 2, line 7 - line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2250249 (MARSH MICHAEL GEORGE) [A] 1 * figures 1,1A *; | [DA]US5564750 (BAJOREK JAY E [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |