EP1331226 - Fullerene derivatives and their metal complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | For all designated states Nakamura, Eiichi 5-3-3-1001, Honkomagome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakamura, Eiichi 5-3-3-1001, Honkomagome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | |||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakamura, Eiichi 5-3-3-1001, Honkomagome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | |||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakamura, Eiichi 5-3-3-1001, Honkomagome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Eiichi 5-3-3-1001, Honkomagome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | 02 /
Matsuo, Yutaka 5-28-3-601, Hongo, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001659.6 | 24.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | JP20020016144 | 24.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002016144 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331226 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1331226 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/16, C07F7/08, C07F15/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
C07F15/0073 (EP,US);
C07F7/0805 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/31] | C07F7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/37] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fullerenderivate und deren Metall-Komplexe | [2003/31] | English: | Fullerene derivatives and their metal complexes | [2003/31] | French: | Dérivés de fullérènes et leurs complexes métalliques | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2006 | 18.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.07.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/50] | 14.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0789972 ; | [X] - NAGASHIMA, HIDEO ET AL, "Efficient photooxygenation of olefins by a C60 derivative bearing an organofluorine tail", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1999), no. 6, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 469 - 70, XP009018165 [X] 1-6,10,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.1999.469 | [X] - NAGASHIMA, HIDEO ET AL, "Electronic structures and redox properties of silylmethylated C60", TETRAHEDRON, (1996), vol. 52, no. 14, pages 5053 - 64, XP004104260 [X] 1-6,10,15 * page 5054 * * page 5056 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(96)00113-5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07089972 A 19950404 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 1-6,10,15 * abstract * | [X] - NAGASHIMA, HIDEO ET AL, "Chlorosilanes and Silyl Triflates Containing C60 as a Partial Structure. Versatile Synthetic Entry Linking the C60 Moieties with Alcohols, Phenols and Silica", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19950811), vol. 60, no. 16, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5966 - 7, XP002258204 [X] 1-6,10,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00121a004 | [DX] - NAGASHIMA, HIDEO ET AL, "Silylmethylations of C60 with Grignard Reagents: Selective Synthesis of HC60CH2SiMe2Y and C60(CH2SiMe2Y)2 with Selection of Solvents", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19940325), vol. 59, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1246 - 8, XP002258205 [DX] 1-6,10,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00085a007 | [X] - FUJIWARA K ET AL, "Synthesis of a Propargyl Alcohol Having a C60 Cage, Its Transformation into C60 Derivatives with Polar Functional Groups, and the Solubility Measurements", TETRAHEDRON, (19980305), vol. 54, no. 10, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 2049 - 2058, XP004109543 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(97)10415-X | [X] - BOURGEOIS J-P ET AL, "Hexakis-adducts of [60]fullerene with different addition patterns: templated synthesis, physical properties, and chemical reactivity", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (20010516), vol. 84, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1207 - 26, XP002258206 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1522-2675(20010516)84:5<1207::AID-HLCA1207>3.0.CO;2-B | [X] - DRAPER S M ET AL, "Novel acetylene-linked di-cobalt and tetra-cobalt carbonyl clusters", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (19991105), vol. 589, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 157 - 67, XP002258207 [X] 1-3,10 * page 162 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(99)00399-X | [X] - NIERENGARTEN J-F ET AL, "25. Methanofullerene molecular scaffolding: towards C60-substituted poly(triacetylenes) and expanded radialenes, preparation of a C60-C70 hybrid derivative, and a novel macrocyclisation reaction", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1997), vol. 80, no. 1, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 293 - 316, XP009018170 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * | [X] - TIMMERMANN P ET AL, "2. Fullerene-acetylene molecular scaffolding: chemistry of 2-functionalised 1-ethynylated C60, oxidative homocoupling, hexakis-adduct formation, and attempted synthesis of C124(2-)", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1996), vol. 79, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 6 - 20, XP009018169 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * | [DX] - SAWAMURA M ET AL, "Pentaorgano[60]fullerene R5C60(-). A water soluble hydrocarbon anion", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), ISSN 0366-7022, pages 1098 - 1099, XP009018062 [DX] 1-4,7,9,10,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.2000.1098 | [DX] - SAWAMURA M ET AL, "The first pentahaptofullerene metal complexes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19961218), vol. 118, no. 50, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 12850 - 1, XP002258208 [DX] 1-3,7,9,10,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja962681x | [DX] - SAWAMURA M ET AL, "Synthesis of pi-indenyl-type fullerene ligand and its metal complexes via quantitative trisarylation of C70", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19980819), vol. 120, no. 32, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8285 - 6, XP002258209 [DX] 1-3,7,8,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja981256w | [DX] - SAWAMURA M ET AL, "Stepwise synthesis of fullerene cyclopentadienide R5C60(-) and indenide R3C60(-). An approach to fully unsymmetrically substituted derivatives", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2000), vol. 2, no. 13, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 1919 - 21, XP002258210 [DX] 1-4,7,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol005993k | [DX] - MARTIN N ET AL, "C60-based electroactive organofullerenes", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (199811), vol. 98, no. 7, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 2527 - 47, XP002258211 [DX] 1-5,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr9701039 | [DX] - KOMATSU K ET AL, "Organic chemistry of fullerene", GENDAI KAGAKU (MODERN CHEMISTRY), (200006), vol. 351, ISSN 0386-961X, pages 46 - 53, XP009018520 [DX] 1-3,10 * the whole document * |