EP1351022 - Air passage for turbine combustor with shingles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerendas, Miklos, Dr.-Ing. Eichhornstrasse 25 15806 Zossen / DE | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/41] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner, Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001782.6 | 28.01.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | DE2002114570 | 02.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10214570 | [2003/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1351022 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1351022 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1351022 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/06 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
F23R3/06 (EP,US);
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/41] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mischluftloch in Gasturbinenbrennkammer mit Brennkammerschindeln | [2003/41] | English: | Air passage for turbine combustor with shingles | [2003/41] | French: | Passage d'alimentation en air pour chambre de combustion de turbine comprenant des bardeaux | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3303645 (EIICHI ISHIBASHI) [A] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 9 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4132066 (AUSTIN JR GEORGE W, et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 2,4 * * column 1, line 44 - line 65 * * column 2, line 48 - line 58 *; | [A]US4653279 (REYNOLDS HAROLD G [US]) [A] 1* column 2, line 53 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO8806257 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [Y] 8-10 * figures 4-6 * * page 11, line 23 - line 33 *; | [X]EP0937946 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1022437 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 5,6 * paragraph [0021]; figure 2 *; | [XY]GB2353589 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * figure 7 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 20 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 5 * [Y] 8-10; | [A]EP1098141 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3-5,7 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040]; figures 3-6 * | by applicant | EP0972992 | US6145319 |