EP1331535 - Field bus device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDRESS + HAUSER WETZER GmbH + Co. KG Obere Wank 1 87484 Nesselwang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states ENDRESS + HAUSER WETZER GmbH + Co. KG Obere Wank 1 D-87484 Nesselwang / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Wetzer GmbH + Co. KG Obere Wank 1 D-87484 Nesselwang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kellermann, Thomas Dorfstrasse 23 87477 Moosbach / DE | 02 /
Kalteis, Helmut Carl-Orff-Ring 96 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | [2005/32] |
Former [2003/31] | 01 /
Kellermann, Thomas Dorfstrasse 23 87477 Moosbach / DE | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001826.1 | 29.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | DE20021003555 | 29.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10203555 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331535 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331535 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP);
G05B19/0428 (EP);
G05B2219/23047 (EP);
G05B2219/23347 (EP);
G05B2219/24048 (EP);
G05B2219/25014 (EP);
G05B2219/25082 (EP);
G05B2219/25187 (EP);
G05B2219/25192 (EP);
G05B2219/25196 (EP);
G05B2219/25265 (EP);
G05B2219/25428 (EP);
G05B2219/31121 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/17] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Feldgerät | [2003/31] | English: | Field bus device | [2003/31] | French: | Dispositif de terrain | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2006
02.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE KROHNE Messtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 D-47058 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen Patentanwälte, et al, et al Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2006
02.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE KROHNE Messtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 D-47058 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert, et al, et al Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2006
KROHNE Messtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 D-47058 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | 01.03.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.10.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/51] | Appeal following opposition | 29.11.2011 | Appeal received No. T2467/11 | 28.02.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.10.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0895199 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 32 *; | [A]DE10006126 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]DE19914765 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 5, line 2 - column 7, line 65; claims 3,5,8,10 *; | [X]EP1049050 (LOHER AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * * page 7, lines 34-39 *; | [A] - VAN DER BIJL W, DIGITAL DATA COMMUNICATION, CONTROL AND MAINTENANCE, JOURNAL A, SOFT VISION, BRUSSELS, BE, VOL. 34, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 19-23, ISSN 0771-1107, XP000361877 [A] 1-12 * page 21, column L, paragraph 3 * |