EP1336523 - Panel for vehicle roof opening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitterer, Holger Rosenstrasse 102 76287 Rheinstetten / DE | [2003/34] | Application number, filing date | 03001831.1 | 29.01.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | DE2002105961 | 14.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205961 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1336523 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1336523 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/047, B60J7/04, B60J10/10 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B60J7/04 (EP);
B60J10/90 (EP);
B60J7/047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/34] | B60J7/047 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/45] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Deckel für eine Dachöffnung eines Kraftwagens | [2003/34] | English: | Panel for vehicle roof opening | [2003/34] | French: | Panneau pour ouverture de toit de véhicule | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 15.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5658042 (RUEHRINGER ERICH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19756021 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,5-7 * column 4, line 15 - line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6270154 (FAERBER MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6296302 (MARTINUS LENKENS PETRUS CHRIST [NL]) [A] 1* figures 2,4 * | by applicant | DE19739388 |