EP1331751 - Key generating method, contents providing method, ciphered-contents deciphering method, pirate identifying method, contents providing system, user system, trace system, ciphering apparatus, diciphering apparatus, and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsushita, Tatsuyuki Intell. Prop. Div., K. K. Toshiba, 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002014.3 | 28.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | JP20020019134 | 28.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002019134 | JP20020348854 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002348854 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331751 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331751 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04L9/0891 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/2585 (EP,US);
H04N21/26606 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/17] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Schlüssels, Inhaltsbereitstellungsverfahren, Entschlüsselungsverfahren für verschlüsselte Inhalte, Verfahren zur Erkennung von illegalen Benutzern, System zum Bereitstellen von Inhalten, Benutzersystem, Verfahren zur Ablaufverfolgung, Verschlüsselungsgerät, Entschlüsselungsgerät, und Computerprogramm | [2003/31] | English: | Key generating method, contents providing method, ciphered-contents deciphering method, pirate identifying method, contents providing system, user system, trace system, ciphering apparatus, diciphering apparatus, and computer program | [2003/31] | French: | Procédé de génération de clé, procédé de fourniture de contenus, procédé de déchiffrement de contenus chiffrés, procédé d'identification de pirate , système fournisseur de contenus, système d'utilisateur, procédé de tracage, dispositif de chiffrement, dispositif de déchiffrement, et programme informatique | [2006/51] |
Former [2003/31] | Procédé de generation de clé, procédé de fourniture de contenus, procédé de déchiffrement de contenu chiffres, procédé identification de pirate , système fournisseur de contenus, systèm d utilisateur, procédé de tracage, dispositif de chiffrement, dispositif de déchiffrement, et programme informatique | Examination procedure | 28.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 30.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07008802.6 / EP1816783 | EP07008803.4 / EP1816784 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - YOSHIDA M ET AL, A SUBSCRIBER-EXCLUDING AND TRAITOR-TRACING BROADCAST DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, VOL. E84-A, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 247-255, ISSN 0916-8508, XP001006546 [A] 1-37 * page 249 - page 254 * | [A] - LAIH C-S ET AL, On the design of conference key distribution systems for the broadcasting networks, TAIWAN, NETWORKING: FOUNDATION FOR THE FUTURE. SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 28 - APR. 1, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES (INFOCOM), LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, VOL. VOL. 2 CONF. 12, PAGE(S) 14, ISBN 0-8186-3580-0, XP010032386 [A] 1-37 * page 1411 - page 1412 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1993.253406 | [A] - PIEPRZYK J ET AL, Multiparty key agreement protocols, AUSTRALIA, IEE PROCEEDINGS E. COMPUTERS & DIGITAL TECHNIQUES, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, VOL. 147, NR. 4, PAGE(S) 229-236, ISSN 1350-2387, XP006013915 [A] 1-37 * page 232 - page 234 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cdt:20000531 | [A] - KAORU KUROSAWA ET AL, OPTIMUM TRAITOR TRACING AND ASYMMETRIC SCHEMES, ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY- EUROCRYPT. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE THEORY AND APPLICATION OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC TECHNIQUES, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, PAGE(S) 145-157, XP000826868 [A] 1-37 * page 152 - page 156 * |