Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7101144 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2006 | B2 | US2004247433 | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03002472 | 05.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4540357B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2010 | B2 | JP2004239262 | 26.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03002472 | 05.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1452688 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03002472 | 05.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100462524C | 18.02.2009 | C | CN1526916 | 08.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03002472 | 05.02.2003 |