EP1452688 - Steam turbine rotor and method of actively cooling such a rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | Steam turbine rotor, method and use of actively cooling such a rotor | ||
[2016/22] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haje, Detlef, Dr. Paul-Schlesiger-Strasse 13 46236 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
Röttger, Dietmar, Dr. Kämpenstrasse 42 45147 Essen / DE | [2004/36] | Application number, filing date | 03002472.3 | 05.02.2003 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1452688 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
F01D5/084 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2322 (EP,US);
F05D2260/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/20] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampfturbinenrotor sowie Verfahren einer aktiven Kühlung eines Dampfturbinenrotors | [2016/22] | English: | Steam turbine rotor and method of actively cooling such a rotor | [2016/22] | French: | Rotor pour une turbine à vapeur et procédé de refroidissement d'un tel rotor | [2016/22] |
Former [2004/36] | Dampfturbinenrotor sowie Verfahren und Verwendung einer aktiven Kühlung eines Dampfturbinenrotors | ||
Former [2004/36] | Steam turbine rotor, method and use of actively cooling such a rotor | ||
Former [2004/36] | Rotor pour une turbine à vapeur, procédé et utilisation de refroidissement d'un tel rotor | Examination procedure | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 02.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60159304 ; | [X]JPS58135304 ; | [A]JPS611809 ; | [A]JPS58155203 ; | [A]JPS58143102 ; | [X]US2451261 (WARREN GLENN B, et al) [X] 1,18,25 * column 3, line 52 - line 72 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE898100 (VORKAUF HEINRICH DR-ING) [A] 15* figure 2 *; | [XY]US2815645 (DOWNS JACK E) [X] 1-5,7,8,12,14,17-25 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 2 * * figure 2 * [Y] 16; | [X]US3291447 (BRANDON RONALD E) [X] 1,15,18,25 * column 3, line 3 - line 49 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4551063 (RASCHKE KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12-14,17-25 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP1209321 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 16 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851221), vol. 009, no. 326, Database accession no. (M - 441), & JP60159304 A 19850820 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1,4,7,12,14,17,18,25 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831108), vol. 007, no. 250, Database accession no. (M - 254), & JP58135304 A 19830811 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [X] 1,9-11,18,25 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860528), vol. 010, no. 146, Database accession no. (M - 482), & JP61001809 A 19860107 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831213), vol. 007, no. 279, Database accession no. (M - 262), & JP58155203 A 19830914 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831119), vol. 007, no. 261, Database accession no. (M - 257), & JP58143102 A 19830825 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 6 * abstract * |