EP1337133 - Circuit for operating a discharge lamp with a variable frequency during ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busse, Olaf Schochenbergerstrasse 24 80686 München / DE | 02 /
Orth, Klaus, Dr. Söllereckstrasse 13 81545 München / DE | [2003/34] | Application number, filing date | 03002488.9 | 05.02.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | DE2002105896 | 13.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205896 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1337133 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1337133 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/285, H05B41/295 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H05B41/382 (EP,US);
H05B41/2851 (EP,US);
H05B41/2856 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/34] | H05B41/285 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/34] | Title | German: | Betriebsschaltung für Entladungslampe mit frequenzvariabler Zündung | [2003/34] | English: | Circuit for operating a discharge lamp with a variable frequency during ignition | [2003/34] | French: | Circuit pour alimenter une lampe à décharge à fréquence variable pendant l' amorçage | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/17] | 07.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/17] | Appeal following examination | 31.07.2007 | Appeal received No. T1467/07 | 31.07.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.11.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5187414 (FELLOWS MARK W [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 5,8 *; | [X]US6057652 (CHEN WEI [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 28 *; | [A]WO0030413 (MICROLIGHTS LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO0198853 (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * page 12; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO02060228 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [PX] 1 * pages 4-6 * |