EP1338496 - Accessory for a vehicle body and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor GmbH Albert-Einstein-Strasse 14-20 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Horst Offenbacher Landstrasse 537 60599 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 02 /
Grimm, Rainer Sachsenhäuser Landwehrweg 225 60599 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002624.9 | 10.02.2003 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | DE2002107295 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10207295 | [2003/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338496 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338496 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/00 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
B62D29/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Karosserieanbauteil und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2003/35] | English: | Accessory for a vehicle body and its manufacturing process | [2003/35] | French: | Accessoire de carrosserie de véhicule et sa méthode de fabrication | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 28.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.04.2006 | [2007/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3591444 (HOPPE PETER) [X] 1 * column 3, line 33 - line 51 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 5; figure - *; | [A]DE3712926 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * figure 6; claims 1,11,12 *; | [A]EP1086882 (MERITOR AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11* column 5, line 16 - line 48; figure - * |