blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1340830

EP1340830 - Bimetallic saw band [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stahlwerk Ergste Westig GmbH
Letmather Strasse 69
58239 Schwerte / DE
[2003/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Pacher, Oskar Dr.
Kleinweg 6
8041 Graz / AT
02 / Lenoir, Werner
Grabengasse 35
59423 Unna / DE
 [2003/36]
Representative(s)König, Gregor Sebastian, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]König, Gregor Sebastian, Dipl.-Biol., et al
König-Szynka-von Renesse Patentanwälte Lohengrinstrasse 11
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date03002794.007.02.2003
[2003/36]
Priority number, dateDE200210540309.02.2002         Original published format: DE 10205403
[2003/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1340830
Date:03.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1340830
Date:26.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/30, C22C38/40, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, B23D61/12
[2003/36]
CPC:
C22C38/42 (EP,US); B23D61/127 (EP,US); C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US); C22C38/24 (EP,US); C22C38/30 (EP,US);
C22C38/36 (EP,US); C22C38/44 (EP,US); C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US); Y10T428/12965 (EP,US); Y10T428/12979 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9319 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   GB,   SE [2004/22]
Former [2003/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bimetall-Sägeband[2003/36]
English:Bimetallic saw band[2003/36]
French:Scie à ruban bimetallique[2003/36]
Examination procedure27.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
07.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2004Fee for grant paid
11.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0259211  ;
 [A]JPS5837156  ;
 [A]EP0452526  (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claims 11-3; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0569349  (BOEHLER YBBSTALWERKE [AT]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 24 - line 46; examples B,B1,B2; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0566560  (BOEHLER YBBSTALWERKE [AT]) [A] 3* claims 1-4 *;
 [A]DE20002593U  (BOEHLER YBBSTAL BAND GES M B H [AT]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900516), vol. 014, no. 231, Database accession no. (M - 0974), & JP02059211 A 19900228 (HITACHI KOKI CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830521), vol. 007, no. 118, Database accession no. (C - 167), & JP58037156 A 19830304 (DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.