EP1335102 - Electric driving device of a roller shutter or blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOTRONIC ZI Sainte Agathe, Rue Lavoisier 57192 Florange Cedex / FR | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doyen, Armand cabinet Ballot 9, rue Claude Chappe 57070 Metz / FR | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies 11 rue Graham Bell 57070 Metz / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Bentz, Jean-Paul Cabinet Ballot 9, rue Claude Chappe Metz Technopôle 57070 Metz / FR | Application number, filing date | 03002802.1 | 07.02.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | FR20020001604 | 11.02.2002 Original published format: FR 0201604 | [2003/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335102 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/78, E06B9/70 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
E06B9/70 (EP);
E06B9/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/19] |
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Antriebsvorrichtung einer Rollade oder Jalousie | [2003/33] | English: | Electric driving device of a roller shutter or blind | [2003/33] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement électrique d'un volet roulant ou d'un store | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 30.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.03.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0092118 (RADEMACHER WILLI) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19523914 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-5,7,11 * the whole document *; | EP0751279 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |