EP1337043 - Failure detection in an analog-digital conversion function of a microcomputer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niles Parts Co., Ltd. 5-28-6, Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0015 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Niles Parts Co., Ltd. 5-28-6, Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koga, Osamu, c/o NILES PARTS CO., LTD. 5-28-6 Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0015 / JP | 02 /
Uno, Koji, c/o NILES PARTS CO., LTD. 5-28-6 Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0015 / JP | 03 /
Kawamura, Yasuharu, c/o NILES PARTS CO., LTD. 5-28-6 Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0015 / JP | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002877.3 | 08.02.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | JP20020040713 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002040713 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1337043 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1337043 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
H03M1/109 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Erkennung eines Fehlers in der analog-digital Wandlungsfunktion eines Mikrorechners | [2003/34] | English: | Failure detection in an analog-digital conversion function of a microcomputer | [2003/34] | French: | Détection de défaillance d'une fonction de conversion analogique-numérique dans un micro-ordinateur | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 20.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4700174 (SUTHERLAND JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-3* column 5, line 44 - line 60; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9520270 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001111423 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [X] 1 * page 18, line 24 - page 19, line 12; figure 2 *; | [X] - "12-Bit Analog-to-Digital Converters With Serial Control and 11 Analog Inputs (Rev. F)", TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED, Dallas, US, (2000), URL: http://focus.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/tlc2543.pdf, (20040218), XP002271014 [X] 1-3 * page 1 * * page 18 * |