EP1447233 - Offset and screen combination printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYI Precision Tech Corp. 59, Wu-Chung 7 Road, Wu Ku Industry Park Taipei County / TW | [2011/15] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Taiyi Precision Tech Corp. 59, Wu-Chun 7 Road, Wu Ku Industry Park Taipei County / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Jui Peng TAIYI Precision Tech Corporation 59, Wu-Chung 7 Road, Wu Ku Industry Park Taipei County / TW | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002996.1 | 11.02.2003 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447233 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447233 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/30, B29C45/14, B41M3/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
B41M1/06 (EP,US);
B41M1/12 (EP,US);
B41M1/40 (EP,US);
B41M3/008 (EP,US);
B29C45/14688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2005/19] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kombination von Offsetdruckverfahren und Siebdruckverfahren | [2004/34] | English: | Offset and screen combination printing method | [2004/34] | French: | Méthode d'impression avec une combinaison d'impression offset et impression sérigraphique | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 19.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06305296 ; | [A]JPH08207499 ; | [A]US4037008 (TUGWELL DENNIS H) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 53 - column 7, line 51; figure 6 *; | [A]DE4139253 (GIEHL OTMAR [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 43 - line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0218149 (PEKONEN JUKKA [FI], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1188534 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030]; figure 6 *; | [A]US6396444 (GOWARD JASON [GB], et al) [A] * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 26 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06305296 A 19941101 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08207499 A 19960813 (TAKAMIZAWA YUKIO;TSUZUKI YAKUMO) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | US4037008 | EP1188534 |