EP1346881 - Method for the reception of data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/39] | Method and apparatus for the reception of data | ||
[2005/31] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Andreas Nelkenweg 10 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | 02 /
Oeffinger, Bernd Rotenbergstrasse 4 70734 Fellbach / DE | 03 /
Sorg, Michael Katharina-Schmitz-Strasse 20 50226 Frechen / DE | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 03003020.9 | 12.02.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | DE2002113165 | 23.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10213165 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1346881 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1346881 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, H04L29/08, B60R16/02 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G06F21/572 (EP,US);
G06F21/51 (EP,US);
G06F8/654 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | B60R16/02, G06F9/445, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/03] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Übernehmen von Daten | [2005/31] | English: | Method for the reception of data | [2005/31] | French: | Procédé de réception de données | [2005/31] |
Former [2003/39] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Übernehmen von Daten | ||
Former [2003/39] | Method and apparatus for the reception of data | ||
Former [2003/39] | Méthode et dispositif de réception de données | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4218804 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1,12,13 * column 5 * [A] 2-11; | [XAY]DE19620885 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,12,13 * column 2 * [A] 2-4,9-11 [Y] 5-8; | [XA]EP1128265 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0026] *[A] 2-11; | [XAY]DE10037397 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-13 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] * [A] 4 [Y] 5-8 | by applicant | DE19921845 | DE10008974 |