EP1308722 - Rapid characterization of polymers with heated injection probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symyx Solutions, Inc. 415 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states Symyx Solutions Inc. 415 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Symyx Technologies, Inc. 3100 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlson, Eric 4133 Wilkie Way Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Safir, Adam 323 Alcatraz Avenue 7 Oakland, CA 94618 / US | 03 /
Petro, Miroslav Apt. 2200, 1035 Aster Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
Nielson, Ralph, B. 5760 Harder Street San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 05 /
Lee, Thomas, S. 904 Webster Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 06 /
Frechet, Jean, M.J. 6414 Swainland Road Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 07 /
Dales, G., Cameron 859 Colorado Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 08 /
Kuebler, Sigrid, C. 1526 Woodmeadow Court San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 09 /
Bennett, James 652 Robin Drive Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003137.1 | 02.04.1999 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US19980080652P | 03.04.1998 Original published format: US 80652 P | US19990227558 | 08.01.1999 Original published format: US 227558 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308722 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308722 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/02, G01N33/44, G01N30/88 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
G01N35/1097 (EP);
B01D15/12 (EP);
B01D15/14 (EP);
B01J19/26 (EP);
B01J20/28078 (EP);
G01N15/0205 (EP);
G01N30/16 (EP);
G01N30/30 (EP);
G01N30/60 (EP);
G01N35/085 (EP);
B01D15/26 (EP);
B01D15/265 (EP);
B01D15/325 (EP);
B01D15/34 (EP);
B01J2219/00119 (EP);
B01J2219/00274 (EP);
G01N2015/0288 (EP);
G01N2015/0294 (EP);
G01N2030/347 (EP);
G01N2030/885 (EP);
G01N2030/8886 (EP);
| C-Set: |
G01N2030/347, G01N30/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | G01N30/30, G01N30/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/17] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnelle Charakterisierung von Polymeren mit Hilfe einer geheizten Injektionssonde | [2003/19] | English: | Rapid characterization of polymers with heated injection probe | [2003/19] | French: | Caractérisation rapide de polymères par sonde injecteur chauffée | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99919778.3 / EP1018002 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990919778) is 12.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4930898 (MILLER-IHLI NANCY J [US]) [A] 1,21 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 52 *; | [A]US5597733 (BELL CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 1,21 * column 3, lines 50-55 * * column 4, lines 7-27 * * column 4, lines 33-39 ** column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 18 * |