EP1338658 - Method and device for heat treating workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTFALEN AG Industrieweg 43-63 48155 Münster / DE | For all designated states WMU WÄrmebehandlungsanlagen für Industrie und Umwelttechnik GmbH Edisonstrasse 15 59199 Bönen / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states WESTFALEN AG Industrieweg 43-63 D-48155 Münster / DE | ||
For all designated states WMU WÄrmebehandlungsanlagen für Industrie und Umwelttechnik GmbH Edisonstrasse 15 59199 Bönen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breloer, Andreas Zum Toedtfeld 43a 59174 Kamen / DE | 02 /
Uschkoreit Ewaldstrasse 5 59174 Kamen / DE | 03 /
Thurow, Reiner Liethe 28 59514 Welver / DE | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB Zeppelinstraße 4 78234 Engen / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2003/35] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003368.2 | 14.02.2003 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | DE2002108267 | 26.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10208267 | [2003/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1338658 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1338658 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338658 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/76, C21D9/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C21D1/763 (EP);
C21D1/76 (EP);
C21D9/0056 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/35] | C21D1/76, C21D1/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung von Werkstücken | [2003/35] | English: | Method and device for heat treating workpieces | [2003/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement thermique de pièces | [2015/33] |
Former [2003/35] | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement termique de pièces | Examination procedure | 26.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2003 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 14.02.2016 | LU | 14.02.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GB | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.02.2003 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.02.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.02.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62139810 ; | [Y]EP0282715 (JUNKER GMBH O [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * column 2 - column 3; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0320763 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * column 3 - column 4; claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE19651878 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871202), vol. 0113, no. 69, Database accession no. (C - 461), & JP62139810 A 19870623 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | US4414043 |