13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
20.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
28.03.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
08.02.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
20.04.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
15.03.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.04.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.09.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] |
04.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
10.12.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
25.07.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |
25.07.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |