Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6882060 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2005 | B2 | US2004066044 | 08.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002040639 | 18.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3840416B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2006 | B2 | JP2003244996 | 29.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002040639 | 18.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1343247 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2007 | B1 | EP1343247 | 02.02.2005 | A3 | EP1343247 | 10.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2002040639 | 18.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE363149T | 15.06.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002040639 | 18.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60313909T | 17.01.2008 | T2 | DE60313909D1 | 05.07.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002040639 | 18.02.2002 |