Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
05.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
13.05.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
06.05.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.04.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
26.04.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
08.12.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.10.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
15.09.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.08.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
07.05.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.05.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.05.2004 | First examination report | |
14.11.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
14.11.2003 | Change - classification | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
09.05.2003 | Renewal fee | |
09.05.2003 | Change - inventor | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
02.05.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] |
02.05.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] |
10.03.2003 | Change - extension states | |
27.02.2003 | Change - extension states | |
27.02.2003 | Renewal fee |