EP1367719 - AD converter circuit and AD conversion method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Shogo Fujitsu VLSI Limited, 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Hisao Fujitsu VLSI Limited, 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Seeger, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. SEEGER & SEEGER Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003650.3 | 18.02.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | JP20020157190 | 30.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002157190 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1367719 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1367719 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/36, H03M1/14 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
H03M1/147 (EP,US);
H03M1/34 (KR);
H03M1/365 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | H03M1/14, // H03M1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | A/D-Wandlerschaltung und Verfahren zur A/D-Wandlung | [2003/49] | English: | AD converter circuit and AD conversion method | [2003/49] | French: | Circuit de convertisseur A/N et procédé de conversion A/N | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4745393 (TSUKADA TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1 - column 12; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US5349354 (ITO MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1 - column 15; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5745067 (CHOU SHU-KUANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1 - column 6; figure 4 *; | [A]US5923277 (TAKEDA HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-11* column 1 - column 10; figures 1,2 * |