EP1347144 - Fireproofing element, specially for fireproof doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll GmbH & Co. OHG Rockwool Strasse 37-41 45966 Gladbeck / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daschkeit, Axel Im Schulkamp 17 59192 Bergkamen / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, et al Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2003/39] | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003726.1 | 19.02.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | DE2002112332 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212332 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1347144 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1347144 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/94, E06B5/16 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
E04B1/942 (EP);
B32B13/14 (EP);
B32B19/04 (EP);
E06B5/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | E06B5/16, E04B1/94 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/43] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brandschutzelement, insbesondere für Feuerschutztüren | [2003/39] | English: | Fireproofing element, specially for fireproof doors | [2003/39] | French: | Elément pare-feu, en particulier pour portes pare-feu | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/21] | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0213103 (LAXA BRUKS AB [SE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO9002855 (COMBAL & CO AS [NO]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3824598 | DE29507498U |