Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
08.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
30.03.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.12.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
28.12.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
03.12.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.09.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.09.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.09.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
12.12.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
12.12.2003 | Change - classification | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
12.12.2003 | Change - classification | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
08.08.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |