EP1347535 - Transverse connector for terminal blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conrad Stanztechnik GmbH Stettiner Strasse 26 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2007/17] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Conrad, Gerd Mastbruchstrasse 213 A D-33104 Paderborn / DE | ||
For all designated states Hölscher, Heinrich Alderichstrasse 5 D-33098 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stollburges, Martin Thorenknick 3 33100 Paderborn / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Bittner, Thomas L., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Schirmer, Siegfried, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Schirmer, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003998.6 | 24.02.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | DE2002112511 | 21.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212511 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1347535 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1347535 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26, H01R31/08 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
H01R31/08 (EP);
H01R9/2675 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | H01R9/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Querverbinder für Reihenklemmen | [2003/39] | English: | Transverse connector for terminal blocks | [2003/39] | French: | Connecteur transversal pour blocs de jonction | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4582377 (WILMES MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-21; | [YD]DE4411306 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE4400469 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 1,21 * the whole document *[A] 2-20; | [XY]EP0678934 (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE [DE]) [X] 1 * column 8, lines 5,6 * [Y] 2-21; | [XY]EP0797269 (CONRAD GERD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,11,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 5-10,12,13,16-21; | [XY]DE19906246 (CONRAD GERD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8-13,16-20 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7,14,15,21 | by applicant | DE4411306 | EP0797269 | DE19906246 |