EP1315388 - Process for transmitting digitised data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/22] | Process for transmitting data, in particular GSM data | ||
[2014/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPCom GmbH & Co. KG Zugspitzstrasse 15 82049 Pullach / DE | [2007/28] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Ralf Im Muehlfeld 11 71546 Aspach / DE | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Gigerich, Jan, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2007/28] | Gigerich, Jan, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004652.8 | 07.09.1996 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | DE1995144367 | 29.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19544367 | [2003/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315388 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315388 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315388 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1315388 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/18 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US);
H04W28/065 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04L1/1867 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/30 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2013/36] |
Former [2013/35] | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [2003/22] | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Übertragen von digitalisierten Daten | [2014/34] | English: | Process for transmitting digitised data | [2014/34] | French: | Procédé de transmission de données numérisées | [2014/34] |
Former [2003/22] | Verfahren zum Übertragen von Daten, insbesondere von GSM-daten | ||
Former [2003/22] | Process for transmitting data, in particular GSM data | ||
Former [2003/22] | Procédé de transmission de données, notamment des données GSM | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96934415.9 / EP0864237 | Divisional application(s) | EP10181399.6 / EP2265084 | EP10182143.7 / EP2265085 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960934415) is 13.06.2001 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9716819 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); |