EP1342583 - Process and device for printing on glass or ceramic surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joh. Sprinz GmbH & Co. Goethestrasse 36 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofer, Hubert Unterwagenbach 6/1 88285 Bodnegg / DE | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth& Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005175.9 | 07.03.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | DE2002110096 | 08.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210096 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342583 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1342583 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/12, B41M1/34 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
B41M1/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bedruckung von Glasflächen oder Keramikflächen | [2003/37] | English: | Process and device for printing on glass or ceramic surfaces | [2003/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'impression sur des surfaces en verre ou en céramique | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 03.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/14] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1058391 (AMERICAN CAN CO) [X] 1-4,7-14,16-24 * column 1, line 21 - line 40 * * page 1, column 2, line 75 - page 3, column 2, line 124 * [Y] 5,6,15; | [X]US3509087 (GERHARDT ROBERT FRANK) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-15 * column 1, line 10 - line 36 * * column 2, line 53 - line 55 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 17 * * example IV * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 9 *; | [DY]EP0099471 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DY] 5,6,15 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 17 ** page 5, line 16 - line 20 * | by applicant | EP0099471 | DE19728881 |