05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
30.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
05.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
14.04.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
17.03.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
24.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
11.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
28.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
25.03.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |
23.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.09.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
25.08.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
25.08.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.05.2004 |
First examination report |
|
05.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] |
19.03.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
08.08.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |