EP1347178 - Easily cleanable centrifugal pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philipp Hilge GmbH & Co. KG Hilgestrasse 55294 Bodenheim / DE | [2004/45] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Philipp Hilge GmbH Hilgestrasse 55294 Bodenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rust, Heinz In den Haferwiesen 14 55299 Nackenheim / DE | 02 /
Seibert, Friedemann Hauptstrasse 2 66484 Winterbach /Pfalz / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005190.8 | 08.03.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | DE2002112693 | 21.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212693 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347178 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347178 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06, F04D29/04, F04D29/62 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
F04D29/048 (EP);
F04D13/0633 (EP);
F04D13/064 (EP);
F04D13/0646 (EP);
F04D29/628 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Leicht zu reinigende Kreiselpumpe | [2003/39] | English: | Easily cleanable centrifugal pump | [2003/39] | French: | Pompe centrifuge facile à nettoyer | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2005 | CZ | 11.05.2005 | EE | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | IE | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | SI | 11.05.2005 | SK | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | BG | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | HU | 12.11.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
EE | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
SK | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
HU | 12.11.2005 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
EE | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
SK | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
HU | 12.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
SK | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
HU | 12.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
SK | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CZ | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SI | 11.05.2005 | ||
BG | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9631934 (SULZER ELECTRONICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,17 * page 15, line 5 - page 16, line 2 * * page 17, line 23 - line 30; figures 2,8 *; | [A]EP0856666 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 8, line 35 - column 10, line 25; figure 4 *; | [XA]US5939813 (SCHOEB RETO [CH]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 6 * * column 6, line 8 - line 58; figure 6 * [A] 2-4,10,16,17; | [X]US6053705 (SCHOEB RETO [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * column 6, line 48 - column 10, line 32; figure 6B *; | [X]EP1114648 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1,25 * |