EP1323979 - Combustion apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gengo, Tadashi, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Kouichi, Mitsubishi Heavy Indust., Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suga, Keishi, Nagasaki Research & Development Ct. Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd., 717-1, Kukahori-machi 5-chome, Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03005216.1 | 19.10.1998 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP19970302652 | 05.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30265297 | JP19970302653 | 05.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30265397 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323979 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323979 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F23C5/32 | [2003/27] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/27] | Title | German: | Verbrennungsgerät | [2003/27] | English: | Combustion apparatus | [2003/27] | French: | Appareil de combustion | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98308519.2 / EP0915291 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 24.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5971903 ; | [Y]JPS62166209 ; | [XA]GB258760 (THOMAS EDWARD MURRAY) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 7,8; | [A]AT185918B (KOHLENSCHEIDUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0022454 (COMBUSTION ENG [US]); | [A]SU1710938 (SIB VNI TEPLOTEKHNICHESKOGO I [SU]) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840818), vol. 008, no. 180, Database accession no. (M - 318), & JP59071903 A 19840423 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3,4 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880106), vol. 012, no. 001, Database accession no. (M - 656), & JP62166209 A 19870722 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * |