EP1344692 - Roll over protection device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISE Innomotive Systems Europe GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benz, Jörg Oberbierenbach 35 51588 Nümbrecht / DE | 02 /
Krumme, Klaus Martin-Luther-Strasse 3 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | 03 /
Nowack, Reinhard Germinghauser Weg 3 57489 Drolshagen / DE | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005567.7 | 12.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | DE2002110957 | 13.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210957 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344692 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344692 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/13 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B60R21/13 (EP);
B60R2021/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/24] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überrollschutzsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2003/38] | English: | Roll over protection device for vehicles | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre le retournement pour véhicules | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5110185 (SCHMUTZ CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 15 - column 7, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [DX]EP0504482 (TEVES GMBH CO OHG ALFRED [DE]) [DX] 1-3 * page 5, column 5, line 17 - column 5, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0965470 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5* column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]EP1288079 (ISE GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-3,7 * page 5, line 39 - line 44 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 31; figures 1,3 * |