EP1345356 - Topology discovery process and mechanism for a network of managed devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shankar, Laxman 4027 Chamberer Drive 95135 San Jose, California / US | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005602.2 | 12.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | US20020364042P | 15.03.2002 Original published format: US 364042 P | US20020417645P | 11.10.2002 Original published format: US 417645 P | US20030351517 | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 351517 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1345356 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1345356 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345356 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H04L41/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/42] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Mechanismus zur Feststellung der Topologie für ein Netzwerk von verwalteten Geräten | [2003/38] | English: | Topology discovery process and mechanism for a network of managed devices | [2003/38] | French: | Procédé et mécanisme de découverte de topologie pour un réseau de dispositifs contrôlés | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5280480 (PITT DANIEL A [US], et al) [Y] 8,20,32* column 9, line 43 - line 49 *; | [XY]WO9501030 (FARNSWORTH WILLIAM DAVID & HM [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9-19,21-31,33-36 * page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraph 5 * * page 11, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * page 16, paragraph 4 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 18, paragraph 6 * * page 23, paragraph 5 * [Y] 8,20,32 |