Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
13.04.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
12.04.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.02.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
06.02.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
16.09.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.09.2006 | Change - inventor | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
11.07.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.04.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.02.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.07.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
01.07.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
11.04.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.11.2004 | Publication of search report | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
16.07.2004 | Change - classification | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
19.09.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |