Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7080175 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2006 | B2 | US2003220961 | 27.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002073174 | 15.03.2002 | JP2003055006 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003337793 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002073174 | 15.03.2002 | JP2003055006 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1359483 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2007 | B1 | EP1359483 | 22.12.2004 | A3 | EP1359483 | 05.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2002073174 | 15.03.2002 | JP2003055006 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1445957 | 01.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002073174 | 15.03.2002 | JP2003055006 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60313826T | 24.01.2008 | T2 | DE60313826D1 | 28.06.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002073174 | 15.03.2002 | JP2003055006 | 28.02.2003 |