EP1359483 - Network system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imai, Norihiro, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Okada, Kazunori, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2006/42] |
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
Imai, Norihiro, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Okada, Kazunori, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005626.1 | 12.03.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | JP20020073174 | 15.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002073174 | JP20030055006 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003055006 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359483 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359483 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359483 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, G05B19/418 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G05B19/052 (EP,US);
G05B2219/1159 (EP,US);
G05B2219/1208 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25212 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/45] | G05B19/05 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/37] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzwerksystem | [2003/45] | English: | Network system | [2003/45] | French: | Système de réseau | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4751672 (YAMADA AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, paragraph 63 - column 10, paragraph 21; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4888726 (STRUGER ODO J [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 1, paragraph 7 - column 14, paragraph 18; figures 1-14 *; | [X]WO9004833 (SQUARE D CO [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 5, paragraph 8 - page 20, paragraph 16; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5528768 (BECHSTEIN NORBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A]US5978593 (SEXTON DANIEL WHITE [US]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * |