EP1323499 - Locking or expanding pliers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states wolfcraft GmbH Wolff-Strasse 1 56746 Kempenich / DE | [2009/45] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states wolfcraft GmbH Wolff-Strasse 1 D-56746 Kempenich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noniewicz, Zbigniew In der Hardt 22 56746 Kempenich / DE | 02 /
Schüller, Hans-Jürgen Schulstrasse 5 53426 Königsfeld / DE | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al c/o Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005746.7 | 26.01.2000 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | DE19991005594 | 11.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19905594 | DE19991033033 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933033 | [2003/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323499 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323499 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323499 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B25B7/14 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B25B5/06 (EP,US);
B25B7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klemm- oder Spreizzange | [2003/27] | English: | Locking or expanding pliers | [2003/27] | French: | Pince étau ou pince extensible | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 11.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00903630.2 / EP1150804 | EP02004045.7 / EP1236543 | Divisional application(s) | EP09160569.1 / EP2085186 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US1978543 (THEODORE MADEIRA WILLIAM) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 82 - line 102; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US3013456 (ERNFERD ERICSON ALF) [DA] 1 * figure - *; | [DA]FR1347377 (METALLURG DU CRET DE ROC ATEL); | [DA]US4821610 (REDMON JR JOHN W [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 9 - line 55; figure - *; | [DA]WO9814308 (FAST INDUSTRIPRODUKTER HANDELS [SE], et al) |